Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hans-Ulrich Thomale (until 2000-06-30) | 1944-12-06 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Ronald Farber (until 2006-06-30) | 1967-03-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Alexander Kunze (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-01-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Rene Krasselt (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-11-24 | ||||
Mentor Miftari (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-04-04 | ||||
Soren Holz (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-12-10 | ||||
Fernando Dos Santos (from 2000-01-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-02-25 | ||||
Frank Nierlich (from 1999-09-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-05-11 | ||||
Jan Schmidt (from 2000-01-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-02-08 | ||||
Steffen Dunger (until 1999-12-31) | 1967-10-04 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ronald Farber (until 2002-06-30) | 1967-03-15 | ||||
Stefan Stadelmann (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-01-26 | ||||
Jens Starke (until 2000-06-30) | 1963-10-21 | ||||
Sascha Schonfeld (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-04-12 | ||||
Mario Weiss (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-06-28 | ||||
Thomas Wolfrum (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-02-12 | ||||
Daniel Kuttner (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-03-03 | ||||
Ivica Bancic (from 2000-01-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-10-29 | ||||
Andre Krasselt (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-03-08 | ||||
Jorg Schmidt (from 2000-01-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-12-20 | ||||
Ronald Schmidt (until 1999-12-31) | 1977-04-28 | ||||
6 | Arnd Spranger (until 2005-06-30) | 1969-09-13 | |||
8 | Marco Holzel (until 2008-06-30) | 1972-05-19 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Skerdilaid Curri (until 2003-06-30) | 1975-10-06 | ||||
11 | Andrij Sapyschni (until 2008-06-30) | 1972-04-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1999-07-31 15:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1999-08-07 15:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |