Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ralf Zumdick (from 2000-01-01) (until 2001-02-13) | 1958-05-10 | ||||
Bernard Dietz (from 1999-10-25) (until 1999-12-31) | 1948-03-22 | ||||
Ernst Middendorp (until 1999-10-24) | 1958-10-28 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Frank Heinemann (until 2009-09-20) | 1965-01-08 | ||||
Ralf Zumdick (until 1999-12-31) | 1958-05-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Rein van Duijnhoven (until 2006-06-30) | 1967-09-05 | |||
21 | Thomas Ernst (until 2000-12-31) | 1967-12-23 | |||
31 | Stefan Wachter (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-04-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Samir Toplak (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-04-23 | |||
3 | Sven Boy (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-10-02 | |||
4 | Axel Sundermann (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-01-23 | |||
5 | Thomas Reis (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-10-04 | |||
16 | Hilko Ristau (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-04-24 | |||
23 | Mirko Dickhaut (until 2001-06-30) | 1971-01-11 | |||
24 | Michael Bemben (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-01-28 | |||
25 | Frank Fahrenhorst (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-09-24 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Matthias Lust (until 2001-12-31) | 1970-04-27 | |||
7 | Peter Peschel (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-01-26 | |||
8 | Sebastian Schindzielorz (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-01-21 | |||
10 | Yildiray Basturk (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-12-24 | |||
12 | Thomas Stickroth (until 2002-06-30) | 1965-04-13 | |||
14 | Mike Rietpietsch (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-03-26 | |||
15 | Olaf Schreiber (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-09-12 | |||
20 | Bjorn Joppe (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-12-13 | |||
25 | Jan Majewski (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-11-27 | |||
30 | Paul Freier (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-07-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Jacek Ratajczak (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-07-10 | ||||
9 | Achim Weber (until 2000-12-31) | 1969-03-11 | |||
11 | Delron Buckley (until 2001-06-30) | 1977-12-07 | |||
17 | Henryk Baluszynski (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-07-15 | |||
19 | Zdravko Drincic (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-05-01 | |||
22 | Rene Muller (until 2000-12-31) | 1974-05-19 | |||
27 | Marijo Maric (from 1999-09-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-01-12 | |||
31 | Sascha Siebert (until 2001-12-31) | 1977-11-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1999-08-06 18:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1999-10-13 19:00 |
6 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1999-12-01 19:30 |
5 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1999-12-21 20:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |