Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Jorg Hossbach (until 2007-08-06) | 1964-11-13 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Wolfgang Wolf (until 2003-03-03) | 1957-09-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Alfons Higl (from 2000-01-01) (until 2003-03-05) | 1964-12-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Claus Reitmaier (until 2003-08-31) | 1964-03-17 | |||
22 | Holger Hiemann (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-01-12 | |||
30 | Guido Koltermann (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-08-13 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
5 | Brian O'Neil (until 2000-11-12) | 1972-09-06 | |||
6 | Claus Thomsen (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-05-31 | |||
8 | Holger Ballwanz (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-09-07 | |||
12 | Waldemar Kryger (until 2002-06-30) | 1968-11-08 | |||
13 | Marino Biliskov (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-03-17 | |||
28 | Thomas Hengen (from 2000-01-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-09-22 | |||
33 | Marcel Maltritz (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-10-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Christian Brand (until 1999-10-10) | 1972-05-23 | ||||
2 | Frank Greiner (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-07-03 | |||
4 | Nico Dabritz (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-08-26 | |||
7 | Patrick Weiser (until 2005-08-28) | 1971-12-25 | |||
10 | Krzysztof Nowak (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-09-27 | |||
14 | Dorinel Munteanu (until 2003-01-26) | 1968-06-25 | |||
18 | Detlev Dammeier (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-10-18 | |||
24 | Charles Akonnor (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-03-12 | |||
26 | Zoltan Sebescen (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-10-01 | |||
29 | Gerald Schroder (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-02-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Andrzej Juskowiak (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-11-03 | |||
11 | Steffen Baumgart (until 1999-10-05) | 1972-01-05 | |||
16 | Vitus Nagorny (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-06-21 | |||
17 | Jurgen Rische (from 2000-01-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-10-30 | |||
17 | Andre Breitenreiter (until 1999-11-30) | 1973-10-02 | |||
19 | Jonathan Akpoborie (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-10-20 | |||
20 | Markus Feldhoff (until 2001-11-30) | 1974-08-29 | |||
21 | Christian Wuck (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-06-09 | |||
25 | Jean-Kasongo Banza (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-06-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1999-10-13 15:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1999-12-01 19:30 |
5 : 4 |
Schema Compare |