Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Frantisek Straka (until 2001-11-30) | 1958-05-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Nils Heese (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-11-12 | ||||
Manfred Kubik (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-02-25 | ||||
Daniel Eschbach (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-10-05 | ||||
Jochen Gramse (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-11-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Richard Mademann (until 2002-06-30) | 1968-04-25 | ||||
Yasar Kurt (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-03-27 | ||||
Murat Jasarevic (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-03-18 | ||||
Errol Refos (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-03-19 | ||||
Marco Slupek (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-01-26 | ||||
Christian Trummel (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-01-26 | ||||
Boubacar Diop (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-12-31 | ||||
3 | Frank Klemmer (until 2004-06-30) | 1971-03-12 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Robert Kovacic (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-08-09 | ||||
Minas Hantzidis (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-07-04 | ||||
Marcel Peeper (until 2000-06-30) | 1965-09-09 | ||||
Tostao (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-10-12 | ||||
22 | Thomas Rietz (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-04-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Andrija Dabovic (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-09-27 | ||||
James Igwilo (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-11-24 | ||||
Gabriel Raduta (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-09-15 | ||||
Miki Miljak (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-12-29 | ||||
9 | Ales Kohout (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-01-03 | |||
21 | Noel Kipre (until 2004-06-30) | 1972-04-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1999-08-01 15:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |