Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ralf Minge (until 2001-06-30) | 1960-10-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Maurice Gillen (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-12-20 | ||||
Tom Starke (until 2003-12-21) | 1981-03-18 | ||||
Romuald Peiser (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-08-03 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Kleine (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-12-28 | ||||
Mile Bozic (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-11-06 | ||||
Nasir El Kasmi (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-10-02 | ||||
Petr Coupek (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-05-10 | ||||
Nico Reckert (until 2002-06-20) | 1981-09-09 | ||||
Sascha Jagusch (from 2000-09-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-08-08 | ||||
Mirko Casper (until 2001-06-30) | 1982-03-01 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Oliver Dittrich (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-04-16 | ||||
Marko Babic (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-01-21 | ||||
Anel Dzaka (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-09-19 | ||||
Huzeyfe Dogan (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-01-01 | ||||
Michael Habljak (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-09-13 | ||||
Fabian Ewertz (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-07-03 | ||||
Marquinhos (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-09-29 | ||||
Thorsten Burkhardt (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-05-21 | ||||
Thorsten Wittek (until 2001-12-31) | 1976-12-31 | ||||
John Thorrington (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-07-10 | ||||
Landon Donovan (until 2000-08-31) | 1982-03-04 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Markus Daun (until 2001-12-31) | 1980-09-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2000-08-25 19:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |