Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dirk Karkuth (from 2000-12-11) (until 2001-08-24) | 1962-01-09 | ||||
Manfred Lienemann (from 2000-11-30) (until 2000-12-11) | 1946-12-24 | ||||
Josip Kuze (from 2000-09-08) (until 2000-11-29) | 1952-11-13 | ||||
Christoph Franke (until 2000-09-07) | 1944-12-20 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Manfred Lienemann (from 2000-12-12) (until 2001-06-30) | 1946-12-24 | ||||
Manfred Lienemann (until 2000-11-29) | 1946-12-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Antonio Ananijew (until 2001-06-30) | 1965-05-08 | |||
12 | Sebastian Klomich (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-12-22 | |||
12 | Daniel Frohlich (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-08-13 | |||
20 | Steffen Sussner (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-09-26 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Emmanuel Izuagha Ejike (until 2000-09-30) | 1980-02-02 | ||||
2 | Jan Schmidt (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-02-08 | |||
2 | Drazen Podunavac (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-04-30 | |||
3 | Thomas Laudeley (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-11-18 | |||
4 | Damir Biskup (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-12-03 | |||
7 | Torsten Bittermann (until 2002-06-30) | 1968-02-03 | |||
11 | Ulf Mehlhorn (until 2005-06-30) | 1968-06-21 | |||
15 | Daniel Gohlert (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-09-25 | |||
15 | Tino Findeisen (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-06-26 | |||
15 | Jorg Weber (until 2000-12-31) | 1968-11-21 | |||
17 | Jorg Sobiech (from 2001-01-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-01-15 | |||
19 | Marco Franke (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-01-20 | |||
25 | Boban Babunski (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-05-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Andre Krasselt (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-03-08 | ||||
Sven Kohler (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-02-24 | ||||
Samir Muratovic (until 2000-12-31) | 1976-02-25 | ||||
6 | Alexander Tetzner (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-08-23 | |||
8 | Mario Ivankovic (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-02-08 | |||
10 | Nebojsa Krupnikovic (until 2000-12-31) | 1973-08-15 | |||
13 | Kay-Uwe Jendrossek (until 2001-06-30) | 1971-10-25 | |||
16 | Ervin Skela (until 2000-12-31) | 1976-11-17 | |||
17 | Olaf Holetschek (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-07-12 | |||
18 | Karsten Oswald (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-06-30 | |||
21 | Peer Kluge (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-11-22 | |||
23 | Dirk Anders (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-09-26 | |||
30 | Olaf Renn (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-10-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Sebastian Hahnge (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-03-11 | ||||
Alen Avdic (until 2000-12-31) | 1977-04-03 | ||||
14 | Ronny Kujat (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-08-05 | |||
22 | Carsten Lakies (until 2001-06-30) | 1971-01-08 | |||
25 | Marcel Podszus (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-08-20 | |||
26 | Marco Dittgen (until 2000-12-12) | 1974-08-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2000-08-25 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |