Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rolf Dohmen (from 2001-01-29) (until 2001-06-30) | 1952-04-04 | ||||
Felix Magath (until 2001-01-29) | 1953-07-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oka Nikolov (until 2013-06-30) | 1974-05-25 | |||
12 | Dirk Heinen (until 2001-06-30) | 1970-12-03 | |||
23 | Sven Schmitt (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-12-27 | |||
30 | Andreas Menger (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-09-11 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Janos Hrutka (until 2000-12-31) | 1974-10-26 | ||||
2 | Torsten Kracht (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-10-04 | |||
4 | Jens Rasiejewski (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-01-01 | |||
5 | Petar Chubtschew (until 2001-06-30) | 1964-02-26 | |||
13 | Erol Bulut (until 2000-12-31) | 1975-01-30 | |||
16 | Serge Branco (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-10-11 | |||
18 | Alexander Kutschera (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-03-21 | |||
20 | Uwe Bindewald (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-08-13 | |||
28 | Karel Rada (from 2001-01-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1971-03-02 | |||
38 | Vladimir Maljkovic (until 2001-06-30) | 1982-04-18 | |||
40 | Tommy Berntsen (from 2001-01-01) (until 2001-12-31) | 1973-12-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Marco Gebhardt (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-10-07 | |||
6 | Markus Losch (until 2001-06-30) | 1971-09-26 | |||
7 | Thomas Sobotzik (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-10-16 | |||
8 | Ralf Weber (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-05-31 | |||
10 | Horst Heldt (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-12-09 | |||
19 | Gerd Wimmer (until 2001-06-30) | 1977-01-09 | |||
24 | Alexander Schur (until 2006-06-30) | 1971-07-23 | |||
25 | Frank Gerster (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-04-15 | |||
25 | Alexander Rosen (until 2000-12-31) | 1979-04-10 | |||
26 | Giuseppe Gemiti (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-05-03 | |||
28 | Albert Streit (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-03-28 | |||
29 | Stefan Zinnow (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-05-28 | |||
30 | Thomas Zampach (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-12-27 | |||
31 | Peter Deissenberger (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-12-01 | |||
33 | Michael Mutzel (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-09-27 | |||
34 | Christoph Preuss (until 2001-06-30) | 1981-07-04 | |||
36 | Patrick Falk (until 2000-09-30) | 1980-02-08 | |||
37 | Jermaine Jones (from 2001-01-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1981-11-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Jan Age Fjortoft (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-01-10 | |||
11 | Bachirou Salou (until 2000-12-31) | 1970-09-15 | |||
14 | Pawel Kryszalowicz (from 2000-12-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-06-23 | |||
15 | Rolf-Christel Guie-Mien (until 2003-01-02) | 1977-10-28 | |||
17 | Thomas Reichenberger (until 2001-12-31) | 1974-10-14 | |||
21 | Chen Yang (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-01-17 | |||
22 | Ralf Schmitt (until 2002-08-30) | 1977-01-21 | |||
26 | Sasa Ciric (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-01-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2000-08-26 15:30 |
6 : 1 |
Schema Compare |