Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Eduard Geyer (until 2004-11-23) | 1944-10-07 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Petrik Sander (until 2004-11-23) | 1960-11-17 | ||||
Hagen Reeck (until 2004-06-30) | 1959-09-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Thomas Kohler (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-06-17 | |||
12 | Gunnar Berntsen (until 2006-06-30) | 1977-10-30 | |||
23 | Tomislav Piplica (until 2009-06-30) | 1969-04-05 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Vilmos Sebok (until 2002-12-10) | 1973-06-13 | |||
3 | Christian Beeck (until 2005-06-30) | 1971-12-18 | |||
5 | Zanko Zwetanow (until 2001-08-31) | 1970-01-06 | |||
13 | Witold Wawrzyczek (until 2002-06-30) | 1973-05-22 | |||
14 | Rudi Vata (until 2001-12-31) | 1969-02-13 | |||
17 | Janos Matyus (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-12-20 | |||
25 | Faruk Hujdurovic (from 2000-09-13) (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-05-14 | |||
25 | Tamas Szekeres (until 2000-12-31) | 1972-09-18 | |||
28 | Martin Neubert (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-10-30 | |||
31 | Kevin McKenna (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-01-21 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Jorg Scherbe (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-10-19 | |||
7 | Laurentiu Reghecampf (until 2005-01-06) | 1975-09-19 | |||
8 | Bruno Akrapovic (until 2002-12-07) | 1967-09-26 | |||
9 | Toni Micevski (until 2001-12-31) | 1970-01-20 | |||
10 | Steffen Heidrich (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-07-19 | |||
16 | Moussa Latoundji (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-08-13 | |||
18 | Andrzej Kobylanski (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-07-31 | |||
19 | Hamid Termina (from 2001-01-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-01-05 | |||
20 | Rene Trehkopf (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-04-08 | |||
24 | Vasile Miriuta (until 2002-11-22) | 1968-09-19 | |||
30 | Jonny Rodlund (until 2001-06-30) | 1971-12-22 | |||
33 | Ronny Thielemann (until 2003-08-30) | 1973-11-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Sven Unversucht (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-01-10 | ||||
Toralf Konetzke (until 2000-12-31) | 1972-12-10 | ||||
11 | Antun Labak (until 2001-12-31) | 1970-07-14 | |||
15 | Sabin Ilie (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-05-11 | |||
15 | Ferenc Horvath (until 2000-11-30) | 1973-05-06 | |||
21 | Franklin Bittencourt (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-02-24 | |||
22 | Mohamed Lakhouil (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-05-06 | |||
29 | Thomas Neubert (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-11-14 | |||
34 | Sebastian Helbig (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-04-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2000-08-27 15:30 |
0 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2000-11-01 19:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |