Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Decker (until 2002-12-31) | 1949-03-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Maik Wilde (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-08-14 | ||||
1 | Sven Schmidtke (until 2005-06-30) | 1975-02-01 | |||
12 | Phillip Walz (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-12-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Rene Putzier (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-03-21 | ||||
Ali Moustapha (until 2001-06-30) | 1973-11-11 | ||||
2 | Thorsten Grummer (until 2005-06-30) | 1965-09-19 | |||
4 | Assana Tope (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-12-18 | |||
5 | Marko Riegel (until 2006-06-30) | 1974-09-04 | |||
20 | Sven Wittfot (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-11-27 | |||
23 | Soren Warnick (until 2003-06-30) | 1975-01-23 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Daniel Sebor (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-12-11 | ||||
Andres Urbszat (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-01-24 | ||||
2 | Michael Koch (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-09-27 | |||
3 | Stefan Purtz (until 2005-06-30) | 1973-01-19 | |||
8 | Dinalo Adigo (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-07-25 | |||
10 | Jan van Oirschot (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-02-05 | |||
10 | Thomas Haese (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-11-22 | |||
22 | Christian Urgast (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-11-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Sascha Hagen (until 2001-06-30) | 1977-03-10 | ||||
Kai Dittmer (until 2000-12-31) | 1974-10-31 | ||||
11 | Enrico Neitzel (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-04-11 | |||
15 | Lutz Schwerinski (until 2005-06-30) | 1966-02-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2000-08-26 15:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |