Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Peter Vollmann (until 2001-06-30) | 1957-12-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Tim Wiese (until 2002-01-14) | 1981-12-17 | ||||
Peter Martin (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-12-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Hans-Jorg Schneider (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-01-22 | ||||
Thomas Ridder (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-12-13 | ||||
Jan Schanda (until 2001-06-30) | 1977-08-17 | ||||
Vyacheslav Lepyavko (until 2000-12-31) | 1977-03-22 | ||||
Sascha Jagusch (until 2000-08-31) | 1979-08-08 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Adam Cichon (until 2002-12-31) | 1975-10-20 | ||||
Andreas Kokoschka (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-10-13 | ||||
Dieter Schonberger (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-11-15 | ||||
Frank Sus (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-12-04 | ||||
Andre van der Zander (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-10-24 | ||||
Oliver Lindemann (until 2001-07-31) | 1978-07-27 | ||||
Torsten Sumnich (until 2001-06-30) | 1973-10-01 | ||||
Tibor Nadj (until 2001-06-30) | 1973-12-24 | ||||
Mohamed Azima (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-10-17 | ||||
Stefan Majek (until 2001-06-30) | 1970-04-15 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Marco Antwerpen (until 2001-06-30) | 1971-10-05 | ||||
Frank Dopper (until 2001-06-30) | 1971-10-20 | ||||
Sven Schuchardt (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-04-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2000-08-27 17:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |