Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gerhard Kleppinger (until 2001-08-06) | 1958-03-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Rob Reekers (until 2003-06-30) | 1966-05-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oliver Adler (until 2005-06-30) | 1967-10-14 | |||
20 | Bozidar Urosevic (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-02-09 | |||
28 | Christian Borkel (until 2001-06-30) | 1981-04-15 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Peter Quallo (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-10-02 | |||
4 | Sven Backhaus (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-06-01 | |||
5 | Daniel Ciuca (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-06-01 | |||
23 | Alexander Maul (until 2001-09-01) | 1976-09-24 | |||
28 | Jens Langeneke (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-03-29 | |||
30 | Marcel Rapp (until 2000-12-31) | 1979-04-16 | |||
33 | Karsten Baumann (until 2001-09-30) | 1969-10-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Stephan Tauber (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-10-08 | |||
6 | Jurgen Luginger (until 2003-06-30) | 1967-12-08 | |||
8 | Jorg Lipinski (until 2002-06-30) | 1967-10-31 | |||
10 | Fabrizio Hayer (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-05-11 | |||
11 | Thorsten Judt (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-06-30 | |||
16 | Swetomir Tschipew (until 2001-06-30) | 1977-08-16 | |||
17 | Chiquinho (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-03-21 | |||
18 | Frank Scharpenberg (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-11-30 | |||
19 | Adam Gebka (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-06-18 | |||
32 | Robert Ratkowski (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-08-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Angelo Vier (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-04-23 | |||
12 | Lars Toborg (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-08-19 | |||
14 | Vedran Madzar (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-03-24 | |||
26 | Rene Muller (from 2001-01-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-05-19 | |||
27 | Adis Obad (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-12-05 | |||
31 | Serkan Cenk (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-08-11 | |||
31 | Achim Weber (from 2001-01-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-03-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2000-08-26 15:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |