Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Frank Wormuth (until 2001-03-31) | 1960-09-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Morris Kaczmarek (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-08-16 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Uwe Mohrle (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-12-03 | ||||
3 | Holger Krause (until 2001-06-30) | 1973-09-20 | |||
13 | Alexander Schnetzler (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-04-17 | |||
19 | Thomas Stehle (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-10-26 | |||
23 | David Fall (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-02-27 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gentian Stojku (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-07-24 | ||||
Andreas Kramer (until 2001-06-30) | 1971-08-21 | ||||
Arndt Sillmann (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-08-11 | ||||
Zoran Ponjavic (until 2001-06-30) | 1973-07-31 | ||||
5 | Alois Schwartz (until 2002-06-30) | 1967-03-28 | |||
7 | Markus Knackmuss (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-06-07 | |||
10 | Christian Simon (until 2001-06-30) | 1970-06-30 | |||
14 | Patrick Hagg (until 2011-06-30) | 1979-02-12 | |||
16 | Volker Lindinger (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-09-14 | |||
19 | Adnan Sijaric (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-06-30 | |||
22 | Ingo Backert (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-12-22 | |||
46 | Markus Bahr (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-09-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Bulent Alkan | 1979 | ||||
Aydemir Demir (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-05-25 | ||||
Mario Slawig (until 2001-06-30) | 1970-06-08 | ||||
8 | Marko Barlecaj (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-09-21 | |||
11 | Ivica Magdic (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-11-23 | |||
45 | Mark Romer (from 2000-11-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-06-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2000-08-27 17:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |