Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Lorenz-Gunther Kostner (until 2001-09-13) | 1952-01-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Harry Deutinger (until 2004-04-01) | 1947-02-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jurgen Wittmann (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-08-14 | |||
27 | Peter Sirch (until 2002-06-30) | 1961-12-30 | |||
28 | Gerhard Tremmel (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-11-16 | |||
30 | Guido Koltermann (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-08-13 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Alexander Strehmel (until 2004-01-21) | 1968-03-20 | |||
4 | Ralf Bucher (until 2009-06-30) | 1972-04-06 | |||
6 | Jorg Bergen (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-06-27 | |||
11 | Alexander Bugera (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-08-08 | |||
17 | Jan Seifert (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-10-14 | |||
20 | Dennis Grassow (until 2004-06-30) | 1971-10-10 | |||
21 | Bjorn Hertl (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-08-10 | |||
32 | Hendrik Herzog (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-04-02 | |||
33 | Tobias Iseli (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-08-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Thomas Broich (until 2001-06-30) | 1981-01-29 | ||||
3 | Oliver Straube (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-12-13 | |||
5 | Matthias Zimmermann (until 2005-06-30) | 1970-09-14 | |||
7 | Dirk Hofmann (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-06-06 | |||
8 | Peter Zeiler (until 2001-06-30) | 1970-10-08 | |||
10 | Markus Oberleitner (until 2001-06-30) | 1973-08-16 | |||
12 | Danny Schwarz (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-05-11 | |||
13 | Dzoni Novak (from 2000-10-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-09-04 | |||
18 | Ludwig Kogl (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-03-07 | |||
19 | Marco Haber (until 2001-12-31) | 1971-09-21 | |||
21 | Francisco Copado (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-07-19 | |||
22 | Dietmar Hirsch (until 2001-06-30) | 1971-12-08 | |||
25 | Martin Cizek (from 2001-01-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-06-09 | |||
32 | Stefan Egger (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-12-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Miroslaw Spizak (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-01-13 | |||
9 | Altin Rraklli (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-07-17 | |||
14 | Alfonso Garcia (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-10-24 | |||
15 | Abdelaziz Ahanfouf (from 2001-01-01) (until 2001-12-31) | 1978-01-14 | |||
23 | David Zdrilic (until 2002-06-16) | 1974-04-13 | |||
26 | Andre Breitenreiter (until 2002-09-02) | 1973-10-02 | |||
34 | Thomas Glas (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-04-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2000-08-26 14:30 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2000-11-01 20:00 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |