Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Herman Andreev (until 2002-02-01) | 1966-01-28 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Ingo Nachtigall (until 2001-11-20) | 1961-09-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Alexander Kunze (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-01-12 | |||
28 | Dirk Heinrichs (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-05-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Heiko Marz (until 2001-06-30) | 1965-07-09 | ||||
Pit Grundmann (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-11-16 | ||||
Fernando Dos Santos (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-02-25 | ||||
4 | Marcus Petsch (until 2002-12-31) | 1966-06-08 | |||
6 | Mentor Miftari (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-04-04 | |||
17 | Marco Laaser (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-01-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
10 | Igor Lazic (until 2002-06-30) | 1967-08-08 | |||
19 | Martino Gatti (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-10-23 | |||
21 | Michael Lorenz (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-01-11 | |||
24 | Slawomir Chalaskiewicz (until 2003-06-30) | 1963-11-29 | |||
25 | Almedin Civa (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-04-27 | |||
33 | Bjorn Laars (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-12-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Marco Kuntzel (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-01-22 | ||||
Jacek Ratajczak (until 2001-06-30) | 1973-07-10 | ||||
11 | Cem Efe (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-06-09 | |||
16 | Enrico Rover (until 2006-06-30) | 1969-09-30 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2000-08-26 15:30 |
1 : 6 |
Schema Compare |