Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Steffen Vogler (until 2014-06-30) | 1966-06-17 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Gerd Schwickert (until 2002-11-03) | 1949-08-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Christian Lache (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-06-14 | |||
12 | Martin Wagner (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-07-23 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Durmus Ozcan (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-09-01 | ||||
Sven Zaltenbach (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-09-25 | ||||
Frank Parrotta (until 2001-06-30) | 1973-10-19 | ||||
Alp Dalkilic (until 2001-06-30) | 1971-11-30 | ||||
3 | Frank Wilde (until 2006-06-30) | 1975-03-26 | |||
5 | Kelvin King (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-09-10 | |||
26 | Emmanuel Izuagha Ejike (from 2000-10-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-02-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Richard Walz (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-08-24 | ||||
Necip Incesu (until 2000-12-31) | 1978-01-17 | ||||
4 | Roland Gisinger (until 2001-06-30) | 1971-11-16 | |||
6 | Christian Mehr (until 2001-06-30) | 1981-04-28 | |||
7 | Michael Konig (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-03-08 | |||
8 | Oliver Bunzenthal (until 2004-06-30) | 1972-11-15 | |||
10 | Antonio da Silva (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-06-13 | |||
17 | Timo Becker (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-08-02 | |||
18 | Samir Naciri (until 2001-06-30) | 1979-12-05 | |||
19 | Michael Sauer (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-09-07 | |||
22 | Sascha Amstatter (until 2001-06-30) | 1977-11-08 | |||
23 | Patrick Hornung (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-12-15 | |||
27 | Daniel Dylong (from 2000-10-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-11-17 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Artur Maxhuni (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-10-27 | |||
11 | Michael Guht (until 2001-06-30) | 1973-06-16 | |||
20 | Sead Mehic (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-04-08 | |||
24 | Ermin Melunovic (until 2001-06-30) | 1973-05-18 | |||
28 | Stipan Jakic (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-05-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2000-08-26 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2000-10-31 19:30 |
0 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |