Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Gerry Ehrmann (until 2015-06-30) | 1959-02-18 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Andreas Brehme (until 2002-08-26) | 1960-11-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Reinhard Stumpf (until 2002-07-22) | 1961-11-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Georg Koch (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-02-03 | |||
12 | Roman Weidenfeller (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-08-06 | |||
36 | Tim Wiese (from 2002-01-15) (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-12-17 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Petr Gabriel (until 2003-01-16) | 1973-05-17 | |||
4 | Aleksander Knavs (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-12-05 | |||
5 | Thomas Hengen (until 2004-01-21) | 1974-09-22 | |||
6 | Hany Ramzy (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-03-10 | |||
16 | Taribo West (from 2001-11-12) (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-03-26 | |||
20 | Tomasz Klos (until 2003-06-30) | 1973-03-07 | |||
24 | Harry Koch (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-11-15 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Marijan Christow (until 2004-06-30) | 1973-07-29 | |||
8 | Dimitrios Grammozis (until 2005-04-27) | 1978-07-08 | |||
10 | Lincoln (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-01-22 | |||
13 | Thomas Riedl (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-06-18 | |||
15 | Nenad Bjelica (until 2004-06-30) | 1971-08-20 | |||
17 | Ratinho (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-06-08 | |||
19 | Markus Kullig (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-11-04 | |||
21 | Jeff Strasser (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-10-05 | |||
22 | Andreas Buck (until 2002-01-25) | 1967-12-29 | |||
26 | Torsten Reuter (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-09-15 | |||
28 | Stefan Malz (until 2004-12-31) | 1972-06-15 | |||
30 | Mario Basler (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-12-18 | |||
32 | Jose Dominguez (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-02-16 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Vratislav Lokvenc (until 2004-06-30) | 1973-09-27 | |||
11 | Olaf Marschall (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-03-19 | |||
14 | Youri Djorkaeff (until 2002-02-12) | 1968-03-09 | |||
18 | Jorgen Pettersson (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-09-29 | |||
23 | Silvio Adzic (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-09-23 | |||
25 | Miroslav Klose (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-06-09 | |||
33 | Danko Boskovic (until 2002-06-30) | 1982-01-27 | |||
34 | Michael Mifsud (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-04-17 | |||
40 | Perica Ognjenovic (from 2002-01-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-02-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2001-08-25 15:30 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2001-11-28 19:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2001-12-11 20:20 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2002-01-30 20:30 |
3 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |