Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Georgi Wasilew (until 2002-10-13) | 1946-08-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Iwan Tischanski (until 2002-10-11) | 1952-03-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Sven Beuckert (until 2003-06-30) | 1973-12-12 | |||
17 | Patrick Vogel (until 2002-06-30) | 1983-05-23 | |||
20 | Robert Wulnikowski (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-07-11 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Gert Muller (until 2001-12-31) | 1977-08-10 | |||
3 | Ronny Nikol (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-07-11 | |||
4 | Steffen Menze (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-01-28 | |||
5 | Marko Tredup (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-05-15 | |||
7 | Ivan Kozak (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-06-18 | |||
11 | Daniel Ernemann (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-02-18 | |||
24 | Emil Kremenliew (until 2001-12-31) | 1969-08-13 | |||
33 | Tom Persich (until 2006-06-30) | 1971-09-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Chibuike Okeke (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-09-09 | |||
8 | Kostadin Widolow (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-05-02 | |||
9 | Michael Zechner (until 2001-12-31) | 1975-01-31 | |||
12 | Andreas Ruhmland (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-05-06 | |||
15 | Manuel Benthin (until 2001-12-31) | 1979-03-03 | |||
16 | Christo Koilow (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-09-23 | |||
18 | Sixten Veit (from 2002-01-03) (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-01-07 | |||
19 | Jiri Balcarek (until 2004-06-30) | 1973-04-29 | |||
21 | Cristian Fiel (until 2002-12-31) | 1980-03-12 | |||
22 | Bozidar Durkovic (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-01-04 | |||
25 | Christian Fahrmann (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-10-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
10 | Ferdinand Chifon (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-07-20 | |||
13 | Lutuf Dinc (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-06-30 | |||
14 | Harun Isa (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-06-21 | |||
23 | Sreto Ristic (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-02-07 | |||
29 | Petar Divic (from 2001-12-04) (until 2003-01-08) | 1975-07-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2001-08-26 17:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2001-11-28 19:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2001-12-11 19:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |