Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Sepp Maier (until 2008-06-30) | 1944-02-28 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Ottmar Hitzfeld (until 2004-06-30) | 1949-01-12 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Michael Henke (until 2004-06-30) | 1957-04-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oliver Kahn (until 2008-06-30) | 1969-06-15 | |||
22 | Bernd Dreher (until 2003-06-30) | 1966-11-02 | |||
33 | Stefan Wessels (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-02-28 | |||
36 | Jan Schlosser (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-09-27 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Willy Sagnol (until 2009-01-31) | 1977-03-18 | |||
3 | Bixente Lizarazu (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-12-09 | |||
4 | Samuel Kuffour (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-09-03 | |||
10 | Ciriaco Sforza (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-03-02 | |||
12 | Robert Kovac (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-04-06 | |||
25 | Thomas Linke (until 2005-06-30) | 1969-12-26 | |||
31 | Stephan Kling (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-03-22 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Pablo Thiam (until 2002-12-31) | 1974-01-03 | |||
7 | Mehmet Scholl (until 2007-06-30) | 1970-10-16 | |||
8 | Niko Kovac (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-10-15 | |||
11 | Stefan Effenberg (until 2002-06-30) | 1968-08-02 | |||
16 | Jens Jeremies (until 2006-06-30) | 1974-03-05 | |||
17 | Thorsten Fink (until 2004-06-30) | 1967-10-29 | |||
18 | Michael Tarnat (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-10-27 | |||
20 | Hasan Salihamidzic (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-01-01 | |||
23 | Owen Hargreaves (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-01-20 | |||
28 | Patrick Molzl (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-12-28 | |||
30 | Alou Diarra (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-07-15 | |||
32 | Markus Feulner (from 2001-10-31) (until 2003-12-31) | 1982-02-12 | |||
34 | Florian Heller (until 2002-06-30) | 1982-03-10 | |||
35 | Steffen Hofmann (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-09-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Giovane Elber (until 2003-08-27) | 1972-07-23 | |||
13 | Paulo Sergio (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-06-02 | |||
14 | Claudio Pizarro (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-10-03 | |||
19 | Carsten Jancker (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-08-28 | |||
21 | Alexander Zickler (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-02-28 | |||
24 | Roque Santa Cruz (until 2007-06-27) | 1981-08-16 | |||
26 | Antonio Di Salvo (until 2001-07-19) | 1979-06-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2001-08-27 20:30 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2001-12-12 20:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2002-01-23 20:15 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2002-01-30 20:30 |
3 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2002-03-06 20:30 |
2 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |