Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Armin Kraaz (from 2002-03-09) (until 2002-06-30) | 1965-02-03 | ||||
Martin Andermatt (until 2002-03-08) | 1961-11-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oka Nikolov (until 2013-06-30) | 1974-05-25 | |||
30 | Andreas Menger (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-09-11 | |||
31 | Daniel Haas (until 2002-06-30) | 1983-08-01 | |||
32 | Dirk Heinen (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-12-03 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Erol Bulut (until 2001-12-31) | 1975-01-30 | ||||
4 | Andree Wiedener (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-03-14 | |||
5 | Karel Rada (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-03-02 | |||
6 | Jens Rasiejewski (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-01-01 | |||
8 | Michael Wenczel (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-11-23 | |||
12 | Jae-Won Sim (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-03-11 | |||
13 | Uwe Bindewald (until 2004-06-30) | 1968-08-13 | |||
16 | Serge Branco (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-10-11 | |||
29 | Vladimir Maljkovic (until 2002-06-30) | 1982-04-18 | |||
40 | Tommy Berntsen (until 2001-12-31) | 1973-12-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Gerd Wimmer (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-01-09 | |||
3 | Marco Gebhardt (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-10-07 | |||
7 | Ervin Skela (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-11-17 | |||
11 | Peter Nemeth (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-09-14 | |||
18 | Michael Mutzel (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-09-27 | |||
19 | Albert Streit (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-03-28 | |||
20 | Christoph Preuss (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-07-04 | |||
23 | Stephen Famewo (until 2002-06-30) | 1983-12-30 | |||
24 | Alexander Schur (until 2006-06-30) | 1971-07-23 | |||
25 | Alexander Rosen (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-04-10 | |||
26 | Giuseppe Gemiti (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-05-03 | |||
27 | Giovanni Speranza (until 2002-06-30) | 1982-03-06 | |||
28 | Jermaine Jones (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-11-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Yilmaz Ortulu (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-03-30 | ||||
9 | Pawel Kryszalowicz (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-06-23 | |||
14 | Sasa Ciric (until 2002-06-30) | 1968-01-11 | |||
15 | Rolf-Christel Guie-Mien (until 2003-01-02) | 1977-10-28 | |||
17 | Thomas Reichenberger (until 2001-12-31) | 1974-10-14 | |||
21 | Chen Yang (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-01-17 | |||
22 | Ralf Schmitt (until 2002-08-30) | 1977-01-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2001-08-25 15:30 |
0 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2001-11-28 19:30 |
2 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2001-12-12 19:00 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |