Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Paul Linz (until 2005-05-23) | 1956-01-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Kai Hillmann (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-10-11 | ||||
1 | Daniel Ischdonat (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-06-09 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Michael Prus (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-02-04 | |||
3 | Marcus Koster (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-09-14 | |||
5 | Vito Milosevic (until 2002-06-30) | 1965-10-12 | |||
6 | Roland Benschneider (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-08-22 | |||
12 | Tobias Lorig (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-02-11 | |||
19 | Miodrag Latinovic (until 2005-01-31) | 1970-08-29 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Adnan Kevric (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-05-02 | |||
7 | Claus Grzeskowiak (until 2005-06-30) | 1973-12-30 | |||
7 | Arno Michels (until 2002-06-30) | 1967-09-16 | |||
8 | Niki Wagner (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-03-12 | |||
10 | Rudi Thommes (until 2004-06-30) | 1968-12-17 | |||
16 | Matthias Keller (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-11-20 | |||
22 | Mehmet Dragusha (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-10-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Josephus Yenay (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-09-05 | ||||
9 | Danny Winkler (until 2004-06-30) | 1973-08-16 | |||
11 | Bernhard Weis (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-03-10 | |||
13 | Uwe Hartenberger (until 2001-12-31) | 1968-02-01 | |||
17 | Joseph Aziz (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-01-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2001-08-25 15:30 |
2 : 4 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |