Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gerd Schadlich (until 2007-12-17) | 1952-12-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Holger Erler (until 2007-12-17) | 1950-03-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jorg Hahnel (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-01-11 | ||||
Russi Petkov (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-06-21 | ||||
Dirk Bohme (until 2002-06-30) | 1968-09-06 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Murat Jasarevic (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-03-18 | ||||
Nikolce Noveski (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-04-28 | ||||
Petr Grund (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-09-29 | ||||
Holger Hasse (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-03-15 | ||||
Roman Muller (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-06-29 | ||||
Radek Sionko (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-01-20 | ||||
Udo Tautenhahn (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-08-02 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Matthias Heidrich (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-12-10 | ||||
Kay-Uwe Jendrossek (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-10-25 | ||||
Sascha Kadow (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-07-31 | ||||
Marco Kurth (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-08-18 | ||||
Michel Petrick (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-09-11 | ||||
Alexander Tetzner (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-08-23 | ||||
Maik Kunze (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-03-08 | ||||
Borislav Tomoski (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-09-21 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Marcel Salomo (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-05-27 | ||||
Rostislav Broum (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-06-25 | ||||
Ronny Jank (until 2003-06-30) | 1975-12-01 | ||||
Swen Dreyer (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-01-01 | ||||
Marian Pagels (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-08-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2001-08-25 15:30 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |