Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jens Grosse (until 2002-10-09) | 1966-05-14 | ||||
Hans-Ulrich Thomale (until 2002-06-30) | 1944-12-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Robert Reschke (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-10-23 | ||||
1 | Rene Twardzik (until 2005-06-30) | 1970-06-25 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Dennis Scharrenburg (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-09-08 | ||||
13 | Sebastian Mees (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-09-30 | |||
18 | Tobias Friedrich (until 2002-06-30) | 1973-12-05 | |||
22 | Danny Bach (until 2003-06-30) | 1973-01-31 | |||
28 | Norman Loose (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-01-10 | |||
29 | Thomas Gansauge (until 2003-10-23) | 1970-06-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michael Franz (until 2003-06-30) | 1984-09-21 | ||||
Jakub Lisek (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-01-27 | ||||
Karsten Oswald (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-06-30 | ||||
Jorg Emmerich (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-03-09 | ||||
Ivica Bancic (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-10-29 | ||||
5 | Carsten Strasser (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-07-05 | |||
16 | Sebastian Hartung (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-12-06 | |||
17 | Torsten Raspe (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-08-01 | |||
19 | Silvio Patz (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-07-11 | |||
21 | Torsten Ziegner (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-11-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Frank Seifert (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-10-02 | ||||
Ronny Kujat (until 2001-08-25) | 1974-08-05 | ||||
11 | Ronny Hebestreit (until 2007-06-30) | 1975-01-09 | |||
15 | Tomasz Szewczuk (until 2004-01-12) | 1978-12-03 | |||
20 | Christian Muller (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-01-17 | |||
23 | Henri Fuchs (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-06-23 | |||
24 | Marco Dittgen (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-08-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2001-08-24 17:30 |
9 : 8 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2001-11-27 13:30 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |