Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Lothar Matuschak (until 2011-06-30) | 1948-06-10 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Klaus Tauber (until 2002-06-30) | 1958-01-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
33 | Christofer Heimeroth (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-08-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Andre Wiwerink (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-10-15 | ||||
Stefan Zepanski (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-12-16 | ||||
Sladan Peric (until 2002-06-30) | 1982-04-15 | ||||
2 | Thomas Klasener (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-08-14 | |||
3 | Till Beckmann (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-09-11 | |||
4 | Benjamin Koch (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-02-15 | |||
5 | Krisztian Szollar (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-08-30 | |||
13 | Fabian Lamotte (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-02-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Omer Durgun (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-09-12 | ||||
Aydin Acici (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-09-28 | ||||
8 | Sergio da Silva Pinto (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-10-16 | |||
10 | Tamas Hajnal (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-03-15 | |||
12 | Benjamin Wingerter (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-03-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Serhij Tytartschuk (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-10-07 | ||||
Richard Baron (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-01-07 | ||||
7 | Mijo Stijepic (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-07-07 | |||
9 | Mike Hanke (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-11-05 | |||
11 | Filip Trojan (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-02-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2001-08-26 15:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |