Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Decker (until 2002-12-31) | 1949-03-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Sven Schmidtke (until 2005-06-30) | 1975-02-01 | |||
12 | Phillip Walz (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-12-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Heiko Marz (until 2003-06-30) | 1965-07-09 | ||||
Rene Putzier (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-03-21 | ||||
Rene Putzier (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-03-31 | ||||
2 | Thorsten Grummer (until 2005-06-30) | 1965-09-19 | |||
4 | Assana Tope (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-12-18 | |||
5 | Marko Riegel (until 2006-06-30) | 1974-09-04 | |||
20 | Sven Wittfot (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-11-27 | |||
23 | Soren Warnick (until 2003-06-30) | 1975-01-23 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ramunas Stonkus (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-12-31 | ||||
Daniel Sebor (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-12-11 | ||||
2 | Michael Koch (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-09-27 | |||
3 | Stefan Purtz (until 2005-06-30) | 1973-01-19 | |||
7 | Slavomir Pocisk (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-08-09 | |||
8 | Dinalo Adigo (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-07-25 | |||
10 | Jan van Oirschot (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-02-05 | |||
10 | Thomas Haese (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-11-22 | |||
18 | Hendrik Volzke (until 2007-06-30) | 1975-03-22 | |||
22 | Christian Urgast (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-11-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Ronny Tetzlaff (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-07-01 | |||
11 | Enrico Neitzel (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-04-11 | |||
14 | Oleh Holowan (until 2004-06-30) | 1971-09-21 | |||
15 | Lutz Schwerinski (until 2005-06-30) | 1966-02-18 | |||
21 | Paulo Cesar Rodrigues (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-05-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2001-08-26 15:30 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |