Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Aleksandar Ristic (from 2001-12-17) (until 2003-04-21) | 1944-06-28 | ||||
Dragoslav Stepanovic (from 2001-08-23) (until 2001-12-16) | 1948-08-30 | ||||
Rob Reekers (from 2001-08-07) (until 2001-08-23) | 1966-05-07 | ||||
Gerhard Kleppinger (until 2001-08-06) | 1958-03-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hans-Jurgen Gede (until 2003-06-30) | 1956-11-14 | ||||
Rob Reekers (until 2003-06-30) | 1966-05-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oliver Adler (until 2005-06-30) | 1967-10-14 | |||
24 | Matthias Kleinsteiber (until 2002-01-07) | 1978-01-05 | |||
25 | Christian Borkel (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-04-15 | |||
29 | Emir Hadzidulbic (from 2001-11-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-04-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Peter Quallo (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-10-02 | |||
3 | Janos Radoki (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-03-07 | |||
4 | Pawel Wojtala (from 2002-01-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-10-27 | |||
5 | Daniel Ciuca (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-06-01 | |||
14 | Anthony Tieku (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-03-16 | |||
16 | Mario Wildmann (until 2003-06-30) | 1975-11-17 | |||
20 | Vik Lalic (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-02-09 | |||
21 | Dejan Raickovic (from 2001-09-16) (until 2002-06-30) | 1967-10-27 | |||
23 | Alexander Maul (until 2001-09-01) | 1976-09-24 | |||
28 | Jens Langeneke (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-03-29 | |||
31 | Torsten Schramm (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-02-19 | |||
33 | Karsten Baumann (until 2001-09-30) | 1969-10-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Jurgen Luginger (until 2003-06-30) | 1967-12-08 | |||
7 | Mike Rietpietsch (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-03-26 | |||
8 | Jorg Lipinski (until 2002-06-30) | 1967-10-31 | |||
10 | Fabrizio Hayer (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-05-11 | |||
11 | Thorsten Judt (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-06-30 | |||
15 | Patrick Falk (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-02-08 | |||
17 | Chiquinho (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-03-21 | |||
18 | Frank Scharpenberg (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-11-30 | |||
22 | Daniel Cartus (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-09-02 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Achim Weber (until 2002-04-02) | 1969-03-11 | ||||
9 | Angelo Vier (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-04-23 | |||
12 | Lars Toborg (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-08-19 | |||
14 | Vedran Madzar (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-03-24 | |||
19 | Dimtscho Belijakow (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-10-26 | |||
23 | Sascha Rosler (from 2001-11-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-10-28 | |||
26 | Rene Muller (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-05-19 | |||
27 | Adis Obad (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-12-05 | |||
31 | Serkan Cenk (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-08-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2001-08-25 15:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2001-11-28 19:30 |
3 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2001-12-11 19:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2002-01-30 19:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |