Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Volker Finke (until 2007-06-30) | 1948-03-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Karsten Neitzel (until 2007-06-30) | 1967-12-17 | ||||
Achim Sarstedt (until 2007-06-30) | 1959-10-02 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Richard Golz (until 2006-06-30) | 1968-06-05 | |||
21 | Manuel Schoppel (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-10-30 | |||
24 | Timo Reus (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-05-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Andreas Kaufmann (until 2002-06-30) | 1973-10-06 | ||||
2 | Daniel Schumann (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-02-13 | |||
5 | Oumar Konde (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-08-19 | |||
13 | Stefan Muller (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-03-08 | |||
16 | Lars Hermel (until 2006-06-30) | 1970-09-28 | |||
17 | Boubacar Diarra (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-07-15 | |||
38 | Benjamin Kruse (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-05-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Andreas Zeyer (until 2004-06-30) | 1968-06-09 | |||
6 | Sebastian Kehl (until 2001-12-31) | 1980-02-13 | |||
7 | Lewan Zkitischwili (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-10-10 | |||
10 | Lewan Kobiaschwili (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-07-10 | |||
12 | Soumaila Coulibaly (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-04-15 | |||
18 | Wladimir But (until 2003-08-31) | 1977-09-07 | |||
19 | Sasa Samtaradse (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-09-06 | |||
20 | Ferydoon Zandi (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-04-26 | |||
23 | Florian Bruns (until 2003-01-09) | 1979-08-21 | |||
25 | Michele Borrozzino (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-12-02 | |||
26 | Jan Manner (until 2003-08-17) | 1982-08-27 | |||
28 | Fabian Gerber (until 2003-01-13) | 1979-11-28 | |||
29 | Tobias Willi (until 2005-01-18) | 1979-12-14 | |||
34 | Giorgi Kiknadse (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-04-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Alexander Iaschwili (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-10-23 | |||
11 | Adel Sellimi (until 2003-01-06) | 1972-11-16 | |||
14 | Abder Ramdane (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-02-23 | |||
15 | Volker Hugel (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-06-20 | |||
18 | Mehdi Ben Slimane (until 2002-01-10) | 1973-01-05 | |||
22 | Regis Dorn (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-12-22 | |||
27 | Benjamin Schwehr (until 2002-06-30) | 1982-01-18 | |||
33 | Ibrahim Tanko (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-07-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2001-08-24 19:30 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2001-11-28 19:30 |
3 : 1 PSO |
Schema Compare |