Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Erkenbrecher (from 2001-12-03) (until 2003-02-09) | 1954-11-14 | ||||
Markus Gellhaus (until 2001-12-03) | 1970-06-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Malte Schulze-Happe (from 2001-09-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-08-12 | ||||
Zsolt Petry (from 2002-01-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-09-23 | ||||
1 | Ralf Kellermann (until 2002-06-30) | 1968-09-24 | |||
12 | Lukas Kruse (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-07-09 | |||
26 | Zsolt Petry (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-09-23 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Rytis Narusevicius (until 2002-06-30) | 1967-03-09 | ||||
Daniel Bogdanovic (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-02-28 | ||||
Essele Bakasu (until 2001-12-31) | 1975-03-13 | ||||
2 | Petar Kuschew (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-01-21 | |||
3 | Markus Bollmann (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-01-06 | |||
5 | Pavel Dotchev (until 2003-02-09) | 1965-09-28 | |||
16 | Thorsten Becker (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-05-13 | |||
32 | Gert Muller (from 2002-01-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-08-10 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Frederic Kollmeier (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-01-10 | ||||
Mark Meinhardt (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-01-12 | ||||
Reiner Plasshenrich (from 2002-01-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-12-12 | ||||
Aleksandr Rychkov (until 2001-12-31) | 1974-10-11 | ||||
Peter Berhorst (until 2001-12-31) | 1978-03-29 | ||||
6 | Javor Valtichinov (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-11-23 | |||
8 | Krzysztof Karpowicz (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-05-15 | |||
9 | Asif Saric (until 2002-06-30) | 1965-01-15 | |||
14 | Semir Devoli (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-12-03 | |||
18 | Markus Krosche (until 2014-06-30) | 1980-09-17 | |||
20 | Giuseppe Canale (until 2003-12-31) | 1977-03-17 | |||
21 | Jaroslav Macak (until 2001-12-31) | 1974-01-13 | |||
27 | Jorg Schwanke (from 2002-01-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-01-12 | |||
29 | Michael Zechner (from 2002-01-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-01-31 | |||
34 | Oliver Gloden (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-05-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Ali Gol (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-07-13 | ||||
Daniel Seifert (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-05-03 | ||||
Dennis Offermann (until 2001-12-31) | 1980-01-28 | ||||
11 | Weselin Gerow (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-05-07 | |||
13 | Skito Litimba (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-07-07 | |||
20 | Joakim N'Tsika (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-10-22 | |||
23 | Mahir Saglik (until 2003-06-30) | 1983-01-18 | |||
28 | Sascha Siebert (from 2002-01-01) (until 2002-12-31) | 1977-11-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2001-08-27 20:30 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |