Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Anton Schrobenhauser (from 2002-04-03) (until 2002-05-05) | 1955-08-09 | ||||
Rainer Adrion (from 2001-09-14) (until 2002-04-02) | 1953-12-10 | ||||
Lorenz-Gunther Kostner (until 2001-09-13) | 1952-01-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Harry Deutinger (until 2004-04-01) | 1947-02-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Philipp Heerwagen (from 2001-08-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-04-13 | |||
18 | Michael Gurski (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-03-21 | |||
27 | Peter Sirch (until 2002-06-30) | 1961-12-30 | |||
28 | Gerhard Tremmel (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-11-16 | |||
30 | Guido Koltermann (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-08-13 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Markus Weinzierl (until 2001-12-31) | 1974-12-28 | ||||
2 | Alexander Strehmel (until 2004-01-21) | 1968-03-20 | |||
4 | Ralf Bucher (until 2009-06-30) | 1972-04-06 | |||
11 | Alexander Bugera (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-08-08 | |||
20 | Dennis Grassow (until 2004-06-30) | 1971-10-10 | |||
31 | Ivica Majstorovic (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-09-20 | |||
32 | Hendrik Herzog (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-04-02 | |||
33 | Jan Seifert (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-10-14 | |||
35 | Bernard Schuiteman (from 2002-01-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1973-10-03 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Oliver Straube (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-12-13 | |||
5 | Matthias Zimmermann (until 2005-06-30) | 1970-09-14 | |||
6 | Matthias Lust (from 2002-01-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1970-04-27 | |||
8 | Stefan Lexa (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-11-01 | |||
12 | Danny Schwarz (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-05-11 | |||
13 | Dzoni Novak (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-09-04 | |||
14 | Peter Zeiler (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-10-08 | |||
15 | Goran Sukalo (from 2002-01-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-08-24 | |||
19 | Stefan Leitl (from 2001-11-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-08-29 | |||
19 | Marco Haber (until 2001-12-31) | 1971-09-21 | |||
21 | Francisco Copado (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-07-19 | |||
25 | Martin Cizek (from 2001-12-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-06-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Miroslaw Spizak (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-01-13 | |||
9 | Altin Rraklli (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-07-17 | |||
15 | Abdelaziz Ahanfouf (until 2001-12-31) | 1978-01-14 | |||
23 | David Zdrilic (until 2002-06-16) | 1974-04-13 | |||
26 | Andre Breitenreiter (until 2002-09-02) | 1973-10-02 | |||
28 | Sasa Jakomin (from 2002-01-01) (until 2002-12-31) | 1973-03-15 | |||
29 | Uwe Rosler (from 2002-01-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1968-11-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2001-08-25 15:30 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2001-11-27 19:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |