Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Harry Brobeil (until 2003-06-30) | |||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Holger Betz (until 2018-06-30) | 1978-05-16 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Mark Hugel (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-04-19 | ||||
Goran Dukanovic (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-01-01 | ||||
Andreas Saur (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-08-01 | ||||
Jochen Schmitt (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-05-22 | ||||
5 | Soren Mende (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-04-21 | |||
15 | Gerold Skowranek (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-01-21 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Philipp Lang (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-09-28 | ||||
Grozdan Tokic (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-03-15 | ||||
Oliver Seitz (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-11-14 | ||||
8 | Unal Demirkiran (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-06-24 | |||
28 | Marco Mangold (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-08-21 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Serdar Erdinc (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-01-19 | ||||
Erkan Ayten (until 2002-12-31) | 1979-04-26 | ||||
Ismail Ulger (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-07-13 | ||||
11 | Dragan Trkulja (until 2002-06-30) | 1964-09-30 | |||
19 | Milton Tembo (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-12-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2001-08-26 17:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2001-11-28 19:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |