Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Marcus Sorg (from 2001-08-27) (until 2003-03-09) | 1965-12-24 | ||||
Rainer Zobel (until 2001-08-26) | 1948-11-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Harald Ebertz (until 2002-06-30) | 1967-05-18 | |||
22 | Ronny Kockel (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-12-16 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Nicolas Leblanc (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-04-22 | ||||
2 | Christian Kritzer (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-02-09 | |||
4 | Joachim Cast (until 2004-06-30) | 1968-03-04 | |||
5 | Patrick Milchraum (until 2004-06-30) | 1984-05-26 | |||
15 | Thomas Ritter (until 2002-06-30) | 1967-10-10 | |||
21 | Michael Kuhn (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-05-17 | |||
23 | Oliver Stierle (until 2002-06-30) | 1983-06-13 | |||
28 | Oliver Barth (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-10-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Bernd Eckhardt (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-06-30 | ||||
Preto (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-06-12 | ||||
Olivier Brassart (until 2001-12-31) | 1977-05-20 | ||||
3 | Stefan Minkwitz (until 2004-06-30) | 1968-06-01 | |||
6 | Markus Losch (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-09-26 | |||
7 | Markus Pleuler (until 2002-12-31) | 1970-05-10 | |||
8 | Rainer Scharinger (until 2002-12-31) | 1967-03-04 | |||
14 | Werner Protzel (until 2002-06-30) | 1973-10-05 | |||
16 | Peter Wagner (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-02-22 | |||
17 | Erhan Polat (until 2003-12-31) | 1981-06-19 | |||
19 | Ralf Zimmermann (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-01-07 | |||
22 | Christoph Kunze (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-11-22 | |||
24 | Timo Dorflinger (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-09-19 | |||
25 | Yu Shimamura (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-06-03 | |||
26 | Jago Maric (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-02-03 | |||
27 | Bjorn Dreyer (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-07-27 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Senol Yazici (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-12-17 | ||||
9 | Jens Paeslack (from 2002-01-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-02-25 | |||
10 | Batista Rubim (from 2001-08-01) (until 2003-12-31) | 1973-08-05 | |||
11 | Jeremie N'Jock (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-03-12 | |||
18 | Giuseppe Carnevale (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-06-29 | |||
20 | Giuseppe Greco (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-03-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2001-08-25 15:30 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |