Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Peter Neururer (from 2001-12-04) (until 2005-06-30) | 1955-04-26 | ||||
Bernard Dietz (until 2001-12-03) | 1948-03-22 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Frank Heinemann (until 2009-09-20) | 1965-01-08 | ||||
Nicolas Michaty (until 2006-06-30) | 1973-09-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Rein van Duijnhoven (until 2006-06-30) | 1967-09-05 | |||
13 | Christian Vander (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-10-24 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Samir Toplak (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-04-23 | |||
3 | Martin Meichelbeck (until 2008-06-30) | 1976-11-21 | |||
4 | Mirko Dickhaut (until 2003-01-12) | 1971-01-11 | |||
5 | Soren Colding (until 2006-06-30) | 1972-09-02 | |||
15 | Rouven Schroder (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-10-18 | |||
22 | Thomas Reis (until 2003-06-30) | 1973-10-04 | |||
24 | Michael Bemben (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-01-28 | |||
25 | Frank Fahrenhorst (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-09-24 | |||
28 | Hilko Ristau (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-04-24 | |||
29 | Axel Sundermann (until 2002-06-30) | 1968-01-23 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Matthias Lust (until 2001-12-31) | 1970-04-27 | |||
7 | Paul Freier (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-07-26 | |||
8 | Sebastian Schindzielorz (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-01-21 | |||
10 | Dariusz Wosz (until 2007-06-30) | 1969-06-08 | |||
12 | Thomas Stickroth (until 2002-06-30) | 1965-04-13 | |||
14 | Dietmar Berchtold (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-08-06 | |||
17 | Malek Barudi (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-08-13 | |||
20 | Sergej Mandreko (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-08-01 | |||
23 | Dino Toppmoller (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-11-23 | |||
26 | Bjorn Joppe (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-12-13 | |||
27 | Markus Ehrhard (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-07-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Thomas Christiansen (until 2003-06-30) | 1973-03-11 | |||
11 | Peter Graulund (until 2003-02-28) | 1976-09-20 | |||
16 | Vahid Hashemian (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-07-21 | |||
18 | Marijo Maric (until 2001-09-16) | 1977-01-12 | |||
19 | Mike Busch (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-04-05 | |||
21 | Delron Buckley (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-12-07 | |||
31 | Sascha Siebert (until 2001-12-31) | 1977-11-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2001-08-26 15:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2001-12-11 19:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |