Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Michael Kruger (until 2004-03-13) | 1954-05-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Stephan Loboue (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-08-23 | ||||
2 | Fabian Lucas (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-07-29 | |||
26 | Milan Ancic (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-02-26 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Stefan Lorenz (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-09-19 | ||||
Peter Kleeschatzky (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-06-01 | ||||
Markus Ludicke (until 2002-06-30) | 1982-02-16 | ||||
Maik Franz (from 2001-08-24) (until 2001-08-26) | 1981-08-05 | ||||
5 | Heinrich Worms (until 2004-12-31) | 1983-04-24 | |||
6 | Jan Wiedenroth (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-10-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Sven Muller (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-04-04 | ||||
Ante Sicenica (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-04-05 | ||||
Sebastian Nachillo (until 2003-06-30) | 1983-04-01 | ||||
Carsten Schonefeld (until 2002-06-30) | 1982-05-02 | ||||
7 | Nils Muller (until 2009-06-30) | 1979-08-09 | |||
7 | Ingo Vandreike (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-06-16 | |||
8 | Jan Mutschler (from 2002-01-01) (until 2003-12-31) | 1982-09-11 | |||
8 | Markus Herbst (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-09-01 | |||
14 | Benjamin Siegert (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-07-07 | |||
20 | Michael Habryka (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-04-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Michal Janicki (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-09-29 | ||||
Uche Igwe (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-07-15 | ||||
Babis Cirousse (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-12-04 | ||||
Joshua Kennedy (until 2001-12-31) | 1982-08-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2001-08-25 19:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2001-11-28 19:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |