Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Jorg Hossbach (until 2007-08-06) | 1964-11-13 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Wolfgang Wolf (until 2003-03-03) | 1957-09-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Alfons Higl (until 2003-03-05) | 1964-12-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Claus Reitmaier (until 2003-08-31) | 1964-03-17 | |||
22 | Sead Ramovic (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-03-14 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
4 | Dusan Petkovic (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-06-13 | |||
5 | Emeka Ifejiagwa (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-10-30 | |||
6 | Claus Thomsen (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-05-31 | |||
12 | Waldemar Kryger (until 2002-06-30) | 1968-11-08 | |||
13 | Marino Biliskov (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-03-17 | |||
19 | Thomas Rytter (from 2001-12-06) (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-01-06 | |||
25 | Stefan Schnoor (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-04-18 | |||
31 | Hans Sarpei (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-06-28 | |||
33 | Maik Franz (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-08-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Michael Madsen (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-01-24 | |||
3 | Frank Greiner (until 2003-06-30) | 1966-07-03 | |||
7 | Patrick Weiser (until 2005-08-28) | 1971-12-25 | |||
10 | Krzysztof Nowak (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-09-27 | |||
14 | Dorinel Munteanu (until 2003-01-26) | 1968-06-25 | |||
15 | Tobias Rau (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-12-31 | |||
16 | Gernot Plassnegger (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-03-23 | |||
18 | Dietmar Kuhbauer (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-04-04 | |||
21 | Martin Petrow (until 2005-07-24) | 1979-01-15 | |||
23 | Sven Muller (until 2004-01-09) | 1980-04-04 | |||
24 | Charles Akonnor (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-03-12 | |||
26 | Robson Ponte (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-11-06 | |||
27 | Miroslav Karhan (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-06-21 | |||
28 | Benjamin Siegert (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-07-07 | |||
36 | Michael Habryka (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-04-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Diego Klimowicz (from 2001-12-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-07-06 | |||
9 | Andrzej Juskowiak (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-11-03 | |||
11 | Tomislav Maric (until 2004-01-29) | 1973-01-28 | |||
17 | Jurgen Rische (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-10-30 | |||
20 | Markus Feldhoff (until 2001-11-30) | 1974-08-29 | |||
32 | Joshua Kennedy (until 2002-06-30) | 1982-08-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2001-08-26 17:00 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2001-11-27 19:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2002-01-23 20:15 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |