Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rainer Ulrich (until 2002-06-30) | 1949-06-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Michael Rechner (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-05-27 | ||||
Dietmar Hummel (until 2002-06-30) | 1973-10-20 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
David Fall (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-02-27 | ||||
Markus Kranz (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-08-04 | ||||
Raphael Krauss (until 2002-06-30) | 1973-06-25 | ||||
Oliver Schmidt (until 2002-06-30) | 1973-09-14 | ||||
Carsten Hennig (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-11-06 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Mallam Yahaya (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-12-31 | ||||
Arnold Dybek (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-05-04 | ||||
Michael Oller (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-08-13 | ||||
Sascha Benda (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-02-21 | ||||
Oualid Mokhtari (from 2002-01-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1982-04-29 | ||||
Domenico D'Andrea (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-08-28 | ||||
2 | Marcus Klandt (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-01-19 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Carsten Lakies (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-01-08 | ||||
Mike Bodenstein (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-09-17 | ||||
Enis Dzihic (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-10-12 | ||||
Ali Talib (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-09-18 | ||||
Zdenko Juric (until 2002-06-30) | 1973-11-02 | ||||
Oliver Sturm (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-03-20 | ||||
Richard Bokatola-Lossombo (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-04-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2001-08-24 19:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |