Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Michael Fuchs (until 2005-06-30) | 1970-01-04 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Wolfgang Wolf (from 2003-04-30) (until 2005-10-31) | 1957-09-24 | ||||
Klaus Augenthaler (until 2003-04-29) | 1957-09-26 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Dieter Lieberwirth (from 2003-05-13) (until 2007-06-30) | 1954-01-13 | ||||
Thomas Brunner (until 2003-04-29) | 1962-08-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Sebastian Durnagel (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-03-02 | ||||
1 | Darius Kampa (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-01-16 | |||
12 | Raphael Schafer (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-01-30 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Tomasz Kos (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-04-04 | |||
3 | Frank Wiblishauser (until 2005-08-30) | 1977-10-18 | |||
4 | Milorad Popovic (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-01-18 | |||
5 | Marek Nikl (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-02-20 | |||
10 | Dusan Petkovic (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-06-13 | |||
15 | Stephan Passlack (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-08-24 | |||
18 | Thomas Stehle (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-10-26 | |||
20 | Tony Sanneh (until 2004-06-30) | 1971-06-01 | |||
24 | Andreas Wolf (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-06-12 | |||
39 | Dominik Reinhardt (from 2003-01-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1984-12-19 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | David Jarolim (until 2003-08-31) | 1979-05-17 | |||
7 | Rade Todorovic (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-05-21 | |||
8 | Jacek Krzynowek (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-05-15 | |||
11 | Kai Michalke (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-04-05 | |||
14 | Dieter Frey (until 2004-06-30) | 1972-10-31 | |||
16 | Tommy Svindal Larsen (until 2005-06-30) | 1973-08-11 | |||
17 | Lars Muller (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-03-22 | |||
21 | Michael Kugler (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-09-03 | |||
27 | Junior (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-10-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Martin Driller (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-01-02 | |||
13 | Cacau (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-03-27 | |||
19 | Marco Villa (until 2003-08-28) | 1978-07-18 | |||
23 | Milan Belic (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-08-29 | |||
29 | Sasa Ciric (until 2004-06-30) | 1968-01-11 | |||
37 | Pavel David (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-10-17 | |||
38 | Stefan Kiessling (from 2003-04-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1984-01-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2002-08-31 15:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2002-11-06 19:30 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2002-12-04 19:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |