Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Horst Ehrmantraut (until 2003-11-05) | 1955-12-11 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Rainer Derber (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-02-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Erol Sabanov (until 2004-11-15) | 1974-05-16 | |||
12 | Peter Eich (until 2007-06-30) | 1963-06-18 | |||
13 | Vahid Spago (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-04-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Oliver Schafer (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-02-27 | |||
5 | Christian Kritzer (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-02-09 | |||
14 | Nobutaka Suzuki (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-09-12 | |||
16 | Soren Holz (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-12-10 | |||
18 | Hilko Ristau (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-04-24 | |||
28 | Victor Oppong (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-09-04 | |||
29 | Adiele Echendu (until 2004-06-30) | 1978-11-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Alessandro Caruso (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-07-04 | |||
4 | Claudio Marasa (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-10-01 | |||
6 | Alexander Rosen (until 2003-12-31) | 1979-04-10 | |||
8 | Torsten Lieberknecht (until 2003-08-28) | 1973-08-01 | |||
10 | Michael Oelkuch (until 2003-06-30) | 1973-02-05 | |||
11 | Tamandani Nsaliwa (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-01-28 | |||
15 | Michael Oller (until 2004-06-30) | 1978-08-13 | |||
19 | Kosta Rodrigues (until 2004-01-18) | 1979-08-12 | |||
20 | Marco Laping (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-02-14 | |||
22 | Sanel Nuhic (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-06-04 | |||
24 | Anatoli Muschinka (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-08-19 | |||
40 | Nico Weissmann (from 2002-08-31) (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-04-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Tamas Koltai (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-01-06 | |||
9 | Pierre Halle (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-06-18 | |||
17 | Bjorn Tarillon (until 2005-01-19) | 1981-08-13 | |||
21 | Andreas Haas (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-04-20 | |||
23 | Yilmaz Ortulu (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-03-30 | |||
26 | Thomas Esch (from 2002-09-03) (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-08-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2002-08-30 19:00 |
3 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |