Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Thomas Schlieck (until 2011-06-30) | 1969-12-17 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Benno Mohlmann (until 2004-02-16) | 1954-08-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Frank Geideck (until 2007-02-11) | 1967-04-02 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Mathias Hain (until 2008-06-30) | 1972-12-31 | |||
23 | Dennis Eilhoff (until 2006-06-30) | 1982-07-31 | |||
26 | Heinz Muller (until 2003-01-10) | 1978-05-30 | |||
29 | Simon Henzler (from 2003-01-11) (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-12-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Torjus Hansen (from 2002-08-16) (until 2003-06-30) | 1973-10-29 | |||
3 | Marcio Borges (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-01-20 | |||
4 | Bastian Reinhardt (until 2003-06-30) | 1975-11-19 | |||
8 | Maciej Murawski (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-02-20 | |||
15 | Daniel Bogusz (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-09-21 | |||
16 | Benjamin Lense (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-11-30 | |||
17 | Bernd Rauw (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-01-08 | |||
25 | Sasa Janic (until 2003-06-30) | 1975-05-07 | |||
27 | Martin Amedick (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-09-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Christoph Dabrowski (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-07-01 | |||
6 | Detlev Dammeier (until 2006-06-30) | 1968-10-18 | |||
10 | Fatmir Vata (until 2007-06-30) | 1971-09-19 | |||
11 | Jesus Sinisterra (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-09-12 | |||
12 | Rudiger Kauf (until 2003-06-30) | 1975-03-01 | |||
13 | Michael Sternkopf (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-04-21 | |||
21 | Massimilian Porcello (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-06-23 | |||
22 | Erhan Albayrak (until 2003-01-10) | 1977-04-05 | |||
28 | Dirk Flock (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-05-23 | |||
30 | Ansgar Brinkmann (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-07-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Du-Ri Cha (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-07-25 | |||
9 | Rade Bogdanovic (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-05-21 | |||
14 | Ilija Aracic (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-11-15 | |||
18 | Artur Wichniarek (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-02-28 | |||
19 | Momo Diabang (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-01-21 | |||
20 | Dirk van der Ven (until 2003-01-27) | 1970-03-01 | |||
24 | Marek Heinz (from 2003-01-15) (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-08-04 | |||
33 | Mirnel Sadovic (until 2003-06-30) | 1984-05-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2002-09-01 15:30 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2002-11-05 19:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |