Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Reinders (from 2002-10-25) (until 2004-03-02) | 1955-01-19 | ||||
Peter Vollmann (until 2002-10-20) | 1957-12-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
12 | Dr. Philipp Laux (from 2002-08-08) (until 2003-06-30) | 1973-01-25 | |||
22 | Alexander Kunze (until 2007-06-30) | 1971-01-12 | |||
28 | Jan Spoelder (until 2003-06-30) | 1973-03-14 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Guido Gorges (from 2003-01-20) (until 2003-06-30) | 1973-06-08 | |||
3 | Bernd Eigner (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-05-01 | |||
4 | Abdoul Thiam (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-06-19 | |||
5 | Thomas Ridder (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-12-13 | |||
6 | Markus Kupper (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-08-01 | |||
13 | Janosch Dziwior (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-09-19 | |||
20 | Jan Schanda (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-08-17 | |||
26 | Adama Niang (until 2003-06-30) | 1975-01-09 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Thomas Piorunek (until 2003-01-09) | 1979-07-27 | |||
7 | Markus Osthoff (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-11-19 | |||
8 | Torsten Sumnich (until 2003-06-30) | 1973-10-01 | |||
10 | Rudi Istenic (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-01-10 | |||
15 | Alessandro da Silva (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-11-07 | |||
16 | Holger Karp (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-03-26 | |||
17 | Michel Mazingu-Dinzey (until 2004-06-30) | 1972-10-15 | |||
21 | Sascha Horster (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-04-20 | |||
24 | Tibor Nadj (until 2003-06-30) | 1973-12-24 | |||
27 | Stefan Pientak (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-03-09 | |||
29 | Zdravko Tuzlak (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-04-23 | |||
32 | Marc-Oliver Barton (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-08-01 | |||
33 | Christian Lutz (until 2003-06-30) | 1975-10-31 | |||
34 | Karsten Hutwelker (from 2003-01-28) (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-08-27 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Jacob Thomas (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-02-14 | |||
11 | Dirk Weetendorf (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-10-01 | |||
14 | Sambo Choji (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-03-13 | |||
18 | Jurgen Rische (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-10-30 | |||
19 | Sven Schuchardt (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-04-27 | |||
23 | Lars Fuchs (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-06-21 | |||
25 | Daniel Teixeira (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-04-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2002-08-30 19:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |