Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gerd Schadlich (until 2007-12-17) | 1952-12-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Holger Erler (until 2007-12-17) | 1950-03-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jorg Hahnel (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-01-11 | ||||
Russi Petkov (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-06-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Murat Jasarevic (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-03-18 | ||||
Nikolce Noveski (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-04-28 | ||||
Petr Grund (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-09-29 | ||||
Thorsten Gorke (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-09-22 | ||||
Robert Gerber (from 2003-06-07) (until 2003-06-09) | 1983-04-22 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Tobias Preuss (until 2003-12-31) | 1979-05-01 | ||||
Manuel Benthin (from 2003-01-31) (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-03-03 | ||||
Gregor Berger (until 2003-06-30) | 1975-11-21 | ||||
Jorg Emmerich (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-03-09 | ||||
Matthias Heidrich (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-12-10 | ||||
Kay-Uwe Jendrossek (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-10-25 | ||||
Sascha Kadow (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-07-31 | ||||
Marco Kurth (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-08-18 | ||||
Michel Petrick (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-09-11 | ||||
Alexander Tetzner (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-08-23 | ||||
Frank Berger (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-11-07 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Mirko Ullmann (until 2003-06-30) | 1975-06-12 | ||||
Marcel Salomo (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-05-27 | ||||
Rostislav Broum (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-06-25 | ||||
Michal Hampel (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-05-10 | ||||
Ronny Jank (until 2003-06-30) | 1975-12-01 | ||||
Chwitscha Schubitidse (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-08-31 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2002-08-31 15:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |