Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Peter Gadinger (until 2012-03-27) | 1956-07-06 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Lorenz-Gunther Kostner (from 2002-10-01) (until 2004-12-20) | 1952-01-30 | ||||
Marco Pezzaiuoli (from 2002-09-26) (until 2002-09-30) | 1968-11-16 | ||||
Stefan Kuntz (until 2002-09-25) | 1962-10-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Marco Pezzaiuoli (from 2002-10-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-11-16 | ||||
Marco Pezzaiuoli (until 2002-09-25) | 1968-11-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Thomas Walter (until 2004-06-30) | 1967-03-03 | |||
22 | Bastian Becker (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-06-21 | |||
27 | Martin Fischer (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-12-17 | |||
28 | Christian Adam (from 2003-01-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-01-26 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Marco Grimm (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-06-16 | |||
4 | Mario Eggimann (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-01-24 | |||
5 | Torsten Kracht (until 2003-06-30) | 1967-10-04 | |||
7 | Witold Wawrzyczek (until 2003-06-30) | 1973-05-22 | |||
14 | Jens Boehnke (until 2003-06-30) | 1975-03-08 | |||
18 | Gabriel Melkam (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-03-13 | |||
21 | Tilman Sieverling (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-02-22 | |||
23 | Marcel Lobich (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-04-08 | |||
24 | Carsten Rothenbach (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-09-03 | |||
25 | Thijs Waterink (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-12-26 | |||
30 | Clemens Fritz (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-12-07 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Bernhard Trares (until 2003-06-30) | 1965-08-18 | |||
6 | Christian Hassa (until 2006-06-30) | 1976-10-03 | |||
8 | Stefan Ertl (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-04-21 | |||
10 | Charles Haffner (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-01-06 | |||
15 | Daniel Graf (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-08-03 | |||
17 | Abderrahim Ouakili (from 2003-02-02) (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-12-12 | |||
20 | Marco Engelhardt (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-12-02 | |||
26 | Carlo Espinosa (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-09-29 | |||
31 | Nathaniel Lamptey (until 2003-06-30) | 1983-07-07 | |||
38 | Patrik Jezek (from 2002-11-26) (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-12-28 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Bruno Labbadia (until 2003-06-30) | 1966-02-08 | |||
11 | Danny Fuchs (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-02-25 | |||
12 | Aydin Cetin (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-05-21 | |||
13 | Moritz Hoeft (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-04-09 | |||
34 | Iwan Sajenko (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-10-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2002-08-31 15:30 |
3 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |