Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Norbert Meier (from 2003-01-04) (until 2005-12-08) | 1958-09-20 | ||||
Bernard Dietz (from 2002-11-04) (until 2002-12-31) | 1948-03-22 | ||||
Pierre Littbarski (until 2002-11-03) | 1960-04-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Tomasz Bobel (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-12-29 | |||
22 | Christoph Jacob (until 2002-08-31) | 1978-02-27 | |||
23 | Tobias Rott (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-01-29 | |||
24 | Dirk Langerbein (until 2004-06-30) | 1971-09-09 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Sebastian Backer (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-09-05 | |||
3 | Steven Tweed (until 2003-12-31) | 1972-08-08 | |||
4 | Pavel Drsek (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-09-22 | |||
5 | Philipp Bonig (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-03-20 | |||
13 | Rouven Schroder (until 2004-08-30) | 1975-10-18 | |||
15 | Horst Steffen (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-03-03 | |||
18 | Morten Rasmussen (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-06-11 | |||
22 | Ervin Fakaj (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-06-15 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Ralf Keidel (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-03-06 | |||
7 | Emerson (until 2002-12-31) | 1979-07-01 | |||
8 | Andreas Voss (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-02-27 | |||
11 | Carsten Wolters (until 2007-06-30) | 1969-07-25 | |||
12 | Marc Kienle (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-10-22 | |||
17 | Ilija Gruev (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-10-30 | |||
20 | Michael Zeyer (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-06-09 | |||
21 | Thomas Vana (until 2004-06-30) | 1972-10-09 | |||
26 | Vasile Miriuta (from 2002-11-23) (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-09-19 | |||
32 | Guiseppe Spitali (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-10-02 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Marius Ebbers (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-01-04 | |||
10 | Sercan Guvenisik (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-03-01 | |||
16 | Hilmi Mihci (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-07-08 | |||
19 | Dominik Jansen (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-01-30 | |||
25 | Louis Gomis (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-12-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2002-08-30 19:00 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2002-11-05 19:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |