Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Stefan Kuntz (from 2003-05-27) (until 2003-11-14) | 1962-10-30 | ||||
Werner Lorant (from 2002-12-19) (until 2003-05-26) | 1948-11-21 | ||||
Uwe Fuchs (from 2002-11-26) (until 2002-12-18) | 1966-07-23 | ||||
Uwe Rapolder (until 2002-11-25) | 1958-05-29 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Frank Lelle (from 2003-05-27) (until 2003-11-14) | 1965-02-04 | ||||
Uwe Fuchs (until 2002-11-25) | 1966-07-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Bernd Meier (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-02-11 | |||
23 | Andreas Kronenberg (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-09-10 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Lamine Cisse (until 2004-06-30) | 1971-12-12 | |||
3 | Stefan Fengler (until 2007-06-30) | 1968-04-02 | |||
4 | Petar Vasiljevic (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-11-03 | |||
5 | Michael Zepek (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-01-19 | |||
13 | Everaldo (until 2002-12-31) | 1974-06-07 | |||
15 | Gledson (until 2003-08-27) | 1979-09-04 | |||
18 | Petar Djenic (until 2006-06-30) | 1977-04-14 | |||
33 | Jan Velkoborsky (from 2003-01-21) (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-07-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Chiquinho (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-03-21 | |||
7 | Musemestre Bamba (until 2007-06-30) | 1971-11-10 | |||
8 | Reinhold Daschner (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-10-16 | |||
10 | Marc Arnold (until 2002-12-12) | 1970-09-19 | |||
12 | Sebastian Bonig (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-08-26 | |||
17 | Patrick Ghigani (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-03-16 | |||
20 | Christian Mikolajczak (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-05-15 | |||
21 | Patrick Dama (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-04-05 | |||
22 | Tim Gorschluter (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-08-24 | |||
23 | Slaven Stanic (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-08-23 | |||
27 | Zeljko Sopic (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-07-24 | |||
31 | Darko Anic (from 2003-01-16) (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-03-05 | |||
35 | Ovid Hajou (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-11-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Marcel Rath (until 2005-01-10) | 1975-09-03 | |||
11 | Marcus Feinbier (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-11-30 | |||
16 | Samuel Ipoua (from 2003-01-17) (until 2003-06-30) | 1973-03-01 | |||
16 | Krystian Prymula (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-03-17 | |||
19 | Cyrille Bella (until 2005-06-30) | 1975-06-11 | |||
26 | Ferhat Cerci (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-09-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2002-08-31 15:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2002-11-06 19:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2002-12-04 19:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |