Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Pavel Dotchev (from 2003-02-10) (until 2005-06-30) | 1965-09-28 | ||||
Uwe Erkenbrecher (until 2003-02-09) | 1954-11-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Michael Joswig (until 2004-02-01) | 1975-06-13 | |||
12 | Lukas Kruse (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-07-09 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Petar Kuschew (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-01-21 | |||
3 | Markus Bollmann (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-01-06 | |||
4 | Markus Mrugalla (until 2004-06-30) | 1971-11-04 | |||
5 | Pavel Dotchev (until 2003-02-09) | 1965-09-28 | |||
15 | Patrick Owomoyela (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-11-05 | |||
16 | Thorsten Becker (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-05-13 | |||
22 | Guerino Capretti (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-02-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Javor Valtichinov (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-11-23 | |||
7 | Oliver Gloden (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-05-14 | |||
10 | Roger Schmidt (until 2003-06-30) | 1967-03-13 | |||
13 | David Danne (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-05-11 | |||
14 | Semir Devoli (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-12-03 | |||
17 | Markus Zschiesche (until 2003-08-30) | 1982-02-12 | |||
18 | Markus Krosche (until 2014-06-30) | 1980-09-17 | |||
19 | Paul Lukas Manthey (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-05-18 | |||
20 | Giuseppe Canale (until 2003-12-31) | 1977-03-17 | |||
21 | Yannick Erkenbrecher (until 2003-06-30) | 1983-01-01 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Pavel Dobry (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-02-01 | |||
11 | Weselin Gerow (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-05-07 | |||
23 | Mahir Saglik (until 2003-06-30) | 1983-01-18 | |||
24 | Daniel Scherning (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-10-29 | |||
28 | Sascha Siebert (until 2002-12-31) | 1977-11-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2002-08-31 15:30 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |