Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Wolfgang Frank (until 2004-04-01) | 1951-02-21 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Harry Deutinger (until 2004-04-01) | 1947-02-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Philipp Heerwagen (until 2007-06-30) | 1983-04-13 | |||
12 | Michael Gurski (until 2003-12-31) | 1979-03-21 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Alexander Strehmel (until 2004-01-21) | 1968-03-20 | |||
4 | Ralf Bucher (until 2009-06-30) | 1972-04-06 | |||
13 | Stefan Burgermeier (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-05-20 | |||
15 | Necat Aygun (from 2003-01-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-02-26 | |||
20 | Dennis Grassow (until 2004-06-30) | 1971-10-10 | |||
22 | Ivica Majstorovic (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-09-20 | |||
23 | Dominik Haas (from 2002-08-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-11-22 | |||
26 | Thomas Schwarzbauer (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-12-29 | |||
30 | Christian Endler (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-09-11 | |||
33 | Jan Seifert (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-10-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Oliver Straube (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-12-13 | |||
5 | Matthias Zimmermann (until 2005-06-30) | 1970-09-14 | |||
6 | Matthias Lust (until 2005-06-30) | 1970-04-27 | |||
7 | Hendrik Liebers (from 2003-01-03) (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-12-18 | |||
8 | Thomas Weigartner (from 2003-01-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-04-13 | |||
10 | Francisco Copado (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-07-19 | |||
11 | Stefan Leitl (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-08-29 | |||
14 | Stefan Egger (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-12-08 | |||
16 | Darlington Omodiagbe (until 2004-06-30) | 1978-07-02 | |||
21 | Goran Sukalo (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-08-24 | |||
24 | Oliver Rosgen (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-08-29 | |||
27 | Maximilian Nicu (until 2003-12-31) | 1982-11-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
18 | Angelo Vaccaro (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-10-04 | |||
23 | Mikheil Sajaia (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-12-08 | |||
26 | Andre Breitenreiter (until 2002-09-02) | 1973-10-02 | |||
28 | Ibrahim Aydemir (from 2003-05-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1983-05-19 | |||
28 | Sasa Jakomin (until 2002-12-31) | 1973-03-15 | |||
32 | Olivier Djappa (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-11-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2002-08-30 19:00 |
4 : 2 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2002-11-05 19:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2002-12-03 19:30 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2003-02-05 19:30 |
4 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |