Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Peter Zeidler (from 2002-12-08) (until 2004-08-30) | 1962-08-08 | ||||
Helmut Dietterle (until 2002-12-07) | 1951-06-02 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Peter Zeidler (until 2002-12-07) | 1962-08-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Reinhard Potye (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-05-07 | |||
13 | Tobias Linse (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-08-30 | |||
29 | Sascha Lesch (until 2004-06-30) | 1971-09-29 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Stefan Mittelbach (until 2005-12-31) | 1978-09-02 | |||
6 | Michael Stickel (until 2009-06-30) | 1981-04-14 | |||
7 | Marcel Busch (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-02-02 | |||
8 | Eberhard Ilg (from 2002-08-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-09-19 | |||
8 | Benjamin Schockel (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-08-16 | |||
12 | Patrick Neumann (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-03-26 | |||
14 | Uwe Schneider (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-08-28 | |||
16 | Cassio da Silva (until 2008-01-22) | 1978-11-22 | |||
18 | Torsten Menck (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-08-23 | |||
22 | Tobias Iseli (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-08-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Michael Bochtler (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-10-15 | |||
5 | Martin Braun (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-11-18 | |||
7 | Sachar Theres (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-03-08 | |||
11 | Andreas Mayer (until 2004-12-31) | 1980-12-15 | |||
17 | Lars Muller (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-10-03 | |||
19 | Laszlo Kanyuk (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-01-13 | |||
21 | Emil Noll (until 2004-06-30) | 1978-11-21 | |||
25 | Vulnet Emini (until 2002-12-31) | 1978-09-10 | |||
27 | Karl-Heinz Bruckel (until 2004-12-31) | 1982-09-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Richard Potye (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-10-23 | ||||
3 | Adam Hering (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-10-18 | |||
9 | Christian Seeber (until 2005-12-31) | 1973-02-11 | |||
11 | Robert Spichal (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-11-16 | |||
19 | Holm Hentschke (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-08-19 | |||
23 | Neno Rogosic (until 2005-08-24) | 1973-09-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2002-08-31 15:30 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |