Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Colin Bell (until 2005-01-25) | 1961-08-05 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Stanko Sremac (until 2006-06-30) | 1946-06-15 | ||||
Peter Neustadter (until 2005-01-25) | 1966-02-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Christian Wetklo (until 2010-08-31) | 1980-01-11 | ||||
Sven Hoffmeister (until 2005-06-30) | 1970-10-13 | ||||
Christian Berger (until 2004-06-30) | 1978-06-06 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Christopher Ihm (until 2008-06-30) | 1982-12-21 | ||||
Christian Demirtas (until 2006-11-05) | 1984-05-25 | ||||
Nassim Banouas (until 2006-08-28) | 1986-09-08 | ||||
Daniel Baude (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-03-14 | ||||
Dennis Probst (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-10-11 | ||||
Mohammed Muftawu (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-11-17 | ||||
Marco Walker (from 2003-08-12) (until 2005-06-30) | 1970-05-02 | ||||
Roman Schneider (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-08-02 | ||||
Peter Neustadter (until 2004-12-31) | 1966-02-16 | ||||
Spasoje Bulajic (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-11-24 | ||||
Philipp Eisele (until 2004-06-30) | 1984-02-12 | ||||
Younes Idrissi (until 2004-06-30) | 1984-09-17 | ||||
Sebastian Kuhl (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-10-30 | ||||
2 | Jean Nadjombe | 2001-09-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Fatmir Pupalovic (from 2004-05-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-04-10 | ||||
Michael Falkenmayer (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-11-26 | ||||
Rajko Tavcar (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-07-21 | ||||
Dennis Weiland (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-08-30 | ||||
Stefan Kuhne (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-08-15 | ||||
Giovanni Speranza (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-03-06 | ||||
Torsten Ziegner (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-11-09 | ||||
Sven Kegel (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-03-24 | ||||
Stephan Maas (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-09-03 | ||||
Dimitrios Tsakas (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-03-07 | ||||
Andreas Jantz (until 2004-06-30) | 1984-12-29 | ||||
Antonio da Silva (from 2004-03-01) (until 2004-03-31) | 1978-06-13 | ||||
Christof Babatz (from 2003-10-03) (until 2003-11-23) | 1974-09-03 | ||||
Fabian Gerber (from 2003-10-01) (until 2003-10-31) | 1979-11-28 | ||||
Sandro Schwarz (from 2003-10-22) (until 2003-10-23) | 1978-10-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Christian Bolm (until 2006-06-30) | 1983-09-02 | ||||
Nana Bediako (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-08-25 | ||||
Christoph Teinert (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-01-30 | ||||
Florian Herzog (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-05-01 | ||||
Claudius Weber (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-04-15 | ||||
Tobias Kurbjuweit (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-12-30 | ||||
Fatih Sozen (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-05-07 | ||||
Lofti El Bousidi (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-08-13 | ||||
Igoris Morinas (until 2003-08-28) | 1975-02-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2003-08-30 15:30 |
3 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |