Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ralf Minge (until 2005-09-30) | 1960-10-08 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Dirk Dreher (until 2012-06-30) | 1965-09-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Rene Adler (until 2007-06-30) | 1985-01-15 | ||||
Maurice Gillen (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-12-20 | ||||
Tom Starke (until 2003-12-21) | 1981-03-18 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jan-Ingwer Callsen-Bracker (until 2008-06-30) | 1984-09-23 | ||||
Cataldo Cozza (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-04-13 | ||||
Clemens Fritz (until 2005-09-04) | 1980-12-07 | ||||
Sven Schaffrath (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-07-23 | ||||
Teddy Lucic (until 2004-12-14) | 1973-04-15 | ||||
Alexander Meyer (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-10-19 | ||||
Ingo Hertzsch (from 2003-08-29) (until 2003-08-31) | 1977-07-22 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Christian Beckers (until 2006-06-30) | 1985-07-22 | ||||
Simon Fahner (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-04-21 | ||||
Daniel Bierofka (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-02-07 | ||||
Domenico Cozza (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-01-18 | ||||
Oliver Dittrich (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-04-16 | ||||
David Muller (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-12-22 | ||||
Sezer Ozturk (until 2005-06-30) | 1985-11-03 | ||||
Tim Kruse (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-01-10 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Kenan Sahin (until 2005-01-27) | 1984-10-27 | ||||
Ioannis Masmanidis (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-03-09 | ||||
Gall Dhompirom (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-09-24 | ||||
Erkan Ozturk (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-05-17 | ||||
Sebastian Schoof (until 2003-08-30) | 1980-03-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2003-08-30 15:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |