Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Uwe Kamps (until 2014-06-30) | 1964-06-12 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Holger Fach (from 2003-09-22) (until 2004-10-27) | 1962-09-06 | ||||
Ewald Lienen (until 2003-09-21) | 1953-11-28 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Stefan Mucke (from 2003-09-23) (until 2004-10-27) | 1955-03-26 | ||||
Michael Frontzeck (until 2003-09-22) | 1964-03-26 | ||||
Manfred Stefes (until 2003-09-22) | 1967-03-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jorg Stiel (until 2004-06-30) | 1968-03-03 | |||
31 | Michael Melka (until 2007-06-30) | 1978-07-09 | |||
33 | Otto Fredrikson (until 2003-12-18) | 1981-11-30 | |||
40 | Claus Reitmaier (from 2003-09-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1964-03-17 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Tom Gaal (until 2023-06-30) | 2001-03-03 | ||||
2 | Max Eberl (until 2005-06-30) | 1973-09-21 | |||
4 | Steffen Korell (until 2005-01-31) | 1971-10-27 | |||
5 | Sladan Asanin (until 2004-06-30) | 1971-08-13 | |||
7 | Jeff Strasser (until 2006-08-12) | 1974-10-05 | |||
14 | Milan Obradovic (from 2003-08-26) (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-08-03 | |||
15 | Marcelo Pletsch (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-05-13 | |||
23 | Ruben (from 2004-01-29) (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-01-29 | |||
28 | Sebastian Plate (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-08-07 | |||
44 | Stephan Schulz-Winge (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-09-13 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Bradley Carnell (until 2005-01-20) | 1977-01-21 | |||
6 | Igor Demo (until 2005-04-30) | 1975-09-18 | |||
8 | Ivo Ulich (until 2005-08-10) | 1974-09-05 | |||
11 | Joonas Kolkka (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-09-28 | |||
18 | Pascal Ojigwe (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-12-11 | |||
19 | Bernd Korzynietz (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-09-08 | |||
21 | Markus Hausweiler (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-04-15 | |||
22 | Oliver Kirch (until 2007-06-30) | 1982-08-21 | |||
24 | Peer Kluge (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-11-22 | |||
27 | Marcel Ketelaer (until 2004-03-08) | 1977-11-03 | |||
29 | Thomas Broich (from 2004-01-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1981-01-29 | |||
36 | Enrico Gaede (until 2005-01-07) | 1982-01-31 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Arie van Lent (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-08-31 | |||
10 | Peter van Houdt (until 2004-01-24) | 1976-11-04 | |||
13 | Joris van Hout (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-01-10 | |||
16 | Jan Schlaudraff (until 2004-12-26) | 1983-07-18 | |||
17 | Morten Skoubo (until 2004-01-30) | 1980-06-30 | |||
20 | Andreas Spann (until 2004-06-30) | 1984-05-17 | |||
23 | Lawrence Aidoo (until 2004-01-09) | 1982-01-14 | |||
25 | Vaclav Sverkos (until 2006-01-31) | 1983-11-01 | |||
30 | Tomislav Maric (from 2004-01-30) (until 2004-06-30) | 1973-01-28 | |||
43 | Marcel Podszus (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-08-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2003-08-31 17:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2003-10-29 20:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2003-12-02 20:30 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2004-02-03 20:30 |
4 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2004-03-17 20:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |