Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hansi Portner (until 2010-06-30) | 1962-12-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Agim Dushica (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-10-01 | ||||
Guido Worsdorfer (until 2003-12-31) | 1970-09-18 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Arijan Dervishay (until 2011-06-30) | 1974-08-16 | ||||
Andreas Haben (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-08-08 | ||||
Holger Best (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-05-26 | ||||
Dirk Freudenthal (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-08-12 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dennis Lamby (until 2011-06-30) | 1984-03-13 | ||||
Thomas Arzbach (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-08-06 | ||||
Sebastian Stahl (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-09-11 | ||||
Steffen Becker (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-08-21 | ||||
Vyatcheslav Stoppel (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-09-03 | ||||
Sascha Breitbach (until 2006-06-30) | 1972-06-29 | ||||
Enis Brcvak (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-04-14 | ||||
Christian Moskopp (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-09-10 | ||||
Carsten Kurdeck (until 2004-06-30) | 1978-08-03 | ||||
Marco Reise (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-07-30 | ||||
Jochen Lutkemeier (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-11-21 | ||||
Kiriakos Atzamidis (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-07-11 | ||||
Dirk Metternich (until 2004-06-30) | 1971-01-28 | ||||
Gabrielle Carrazzo (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-07-27 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Thomas Esch (until 2006-06-30) | 1978-08-03 | ||||
Marco Malcangi (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-03-12 | ||||
Valdet Krasniqi (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-10-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2003-08-31 17:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |