Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Jurgen Roth-Lebenstedt (until 2006-06-30) | 1962-10-22 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Paul Linz (until 2005-05-23) | 1956-01-04 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Arno Michels (until 2005-10-24) | 1967-09-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Daniel Ischdonat (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-06-09 | |||
21 | Axel Keller (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-03-25 | |||
23 | Faris Efendic (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-02-20 | |||
24 | Dario Kresic (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-01-11 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Sammy Habte (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-10-14 | |||
3 | Hasan Vural (until 2004-06-30) | 1973-12-17 | |||
6 | Harry Koch (until 2006-06-30) | 1969-11-15 | |||
19 | Miodrag Latinovic (until 2005-01-31) | 1970-08-29 | |||
25 | Sebastian Pelzer (from 2004-01-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-09-24 | |||
27 | Milan Drageljevic (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-02-28 | |||
29 | Marcus Koster (until 2004-05-31) | 1972-09-14 | |||
31 | Igor Budisa (from 2004-01-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-09-23 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Adnan Kevric (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-05-02 | |||
5 | Markus Losch (until 2004-06-30) | 1971-09-26 | |||
7 | Claus Grzeskowiak (until 2005-06-30) | 1973-12-30 | |||
8 | Catalin Racanel (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-09-23 | |||
10 | Rudi Thommes (until 2004-06-30) | 1968-12-17 | |||
12 | Carsten Marell (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-09-08 | |||
13 | Milorad Pekovic (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-08-05 | |||
14 | Sebastian Zimmer (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-08-31 | |||
16 | Matthias Keller (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-11-20 | |||
20 | Daniel Bauer (until 2005-06-30) | 1982-10-17 | |||
28 | Sebastian Becker (from 2004-01-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1985-04-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Danny Winkler (until 2004-06-30) | 1973-08-16 | |||
11 | Antun Labak (until 2005-06-30) | 1970-07-14 | |||
15 | Petar Divic (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-07-11 | |||
17 | Joseph Aziz (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-01-07 | |||
18 | Najeh Braham (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-05-20 | |||
22 | Nico Patschinski (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-11-08 | |||
23 | Thomas Klasen (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-09-16 | |||
25 | Christian Repplinger (until 2003-12-31) | 1979-01-11 | |||
30 | Michael Fleck (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-01-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2003-08-29 19:00 |
4 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |